THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
10/05/25 03:28:52 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 2012
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 3045 Baseline Road
Queensway Carleton Hospital
Division of General Surgery
Ottawa Ontario K2H 8P4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 3434515906
Fax: 6132253652
Address: 1130 Morrison Drive
Suite 170
Ottawa Ontario K2H 9N6
Phone: 3434515906
Fax: 6132253652
Address: Division of General Surgery
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L6
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 499 Raglan Street North
Renfrew Victoria Hospital
Office of General Surgery
Renfrew Ontario K7V 1P6
Phone: 6134327201
Fax: 6134325054

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2017
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Renfrew Victoria Hospital Renfrew
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
Queensway Carleton Hospital Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Renfrew Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: Renfrew

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Queensway Carleton Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. David Carver Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 11 Feb 2019
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Carver (CPSO#: 97787 )
Business Address: 3045 Baseline Rd.
Nepean Ontario K2H 8P4
(613) 721-2000
Business Address: 499 Raglan Street North
Renfrew Ontario K7V 1P6
(613) 432-7201
Business Address: 501 Smyth Road
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L6
(613) 798-5555
Business Address: The Ottawa Hospital
Civic Campus
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 4E9
(613) 798-5555
Business Address: 1130 Morrison Drive
Ottawa Ontario K2H 9N6
3434515906

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 3045 Baseline Road
Queensway Carleton Hospital
Division of General Surgery
Ottawa Ontario K2H 8P4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 3434515906
Fax: 6132253652
Address: 1130 Morrison Drive
Suite 170
Ottawa Ontario K2H 9N6
Phone: 3434515906
Fax: 6132253652
Address: Division of General Surgery
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L6
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 499 Raglan Street North
Renfrew Victoria Hospital
Office of General Surgery
Renfrew Ontario K7V 1P6
Phone: 6134327201
Fax: 6134325054

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2017
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Renfrew Victoria Hospital Renfrew
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
Queensway Carleton Hospital Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Renfrew Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: Renfrew

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Queensway Carleton Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. David Carver Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 11 Feb 2019
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Carver (CPSO#: 97787 )
Business Address: 3045 Baseline Rd.
Nepean Ontario K2H 8P4
(613) 721-2000
Business Address: 499 Raglan Street North
Renfrew Ontario K7V 1P6
(613) 432-7201
Business Address: 501 Smyth Road
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L6
(613) 798-5555
Business Address: The Ottawa Hospital
Civic Campus
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 4E9
(613) 798-5555
Business Address: 1130 Morrison Drive
Ottawa Ontario K2H 9N6
3434515906

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DAVID ALEXANDER CARVER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CARVER is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DAVID ALEXANDER CARVER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CARVER is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 2012

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 2018
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2017
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 29 Jun 2018

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2017

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2012