THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
02/05/25 03:47:20 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2012
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: North York General Hospital
Family Medicine Teaching Unit
4001 Leslie St, 4 South
Toronto Ontario M2K 1E1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 756-6980
Fax: (416) 756-6979

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 18 Jun 2014
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 18 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
North York General Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: North York General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Tiffany Florindo Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 06 Aug 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. T. Florindo (CPSO#: 97814 )
Business Address: North York General Hospital
Family Medicine Teaching Unit
4001 Leslie Street, 4 South
Toronto Ontario M2K 1E1
(416) 756-6980

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: North York General Hospital
Family Medicine Teaching Unit
4001 Leslie St, 4 South
Toronto Ontario M2K 1E1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 756-6980
Fax: (416) 756-6979

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 18 Jun 2014
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 18 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
North York General Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: North York General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Tiffany Florindo Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 06 Aug 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. T. Florindo (CPSO#: 97814 )
Business Address: North York General Hospital
Family Medicine Teaching Unit
4001 Leslie Street, 4 South
Toronto Ontario M2K 1E1
(416) 756-6980

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. TIFFANY MARGARET FLORINDO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FLORINDO is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. TIFFANY MARGARET FLORINDO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FLORINDO is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2012

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 2014
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Jun 2014

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2012