THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:58:55 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2012
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 6-181 Toronto Rd
Port Hope ON L1A 3V5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 705-616-0786
Fax: 705-616-0787
Address: 11 Mill Street North
Port Hope Ontario L1A 2T1
Phone: 705-616-0786
Fax: 705-616-0787

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
Effective: 05 Apr 2019
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Apr 05 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Peterborough Regional Health Centre Peterborough
HOSPITAL: Peterborough Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Peterborough

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Misha O. Moitri Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 31 Oct 2019
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Moitri (CPSO#: 97825 )
Business Address: 1 Hospital Dr
Peterborough ON K9J 7C6
(705) 616-0786

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 6-181 Toronto Rd
Port Hope ON L1A 3V5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 705-616-0786
Fax: 705-616-0787
Address: 11 Mill Street North
Port Hope Ontario L1A 2T1
Phone: 705-616-0786
Fax: 705-616-0787

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
Effective: 05 Apr 2019
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Apr 05 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Peterborough Regional Health Centre Peterborough
HOSPITAL: Peterborough Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Peterborough

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Misha O. Moitri Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 31 Oct 2019
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Moitri (CPSO#: 97825 )
Business Address: 1 Hospital Dr
Peterborough ON K9J 7C6
(705) 616-0786

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MISHA OTHIR MOITRI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MOITRI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MISHA OTHIR MOITRI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MOITRI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2012

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 May 2019
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 29 May 2019
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 27 Sep 2018
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2018
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 29 May 2019

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 29 May 2019

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Sep 2018
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 27 Sep 2018

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2018

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2012