THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
09/05/25 06:04:00 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 2012
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Trillium Health Partners
Department of Radiology
100 Queensway W
Mississauga Ontario L5B 1B8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9058487580
Extension: 7522
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 30 Jun 2017
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Prince Edward Island

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Lakeridge Health Oshawa
William Osler Health System Toronto
Ross Memorial Hospital Lindsay
Campbellford Memorial Hospital Campbellford
Cornwall Community Hospital Cornwall
Norfolk General Hospital Simcoe
Peterborough Regional Health Centre Peterborough
Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital Orillia
Lake of the Woods District Hospital Kenora
Trillium Health Partners Mississauga
Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga
Trillium Health Partners Queensway Health Centre Toronto
HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health
LOCATION: Oshawa

HOSPITAL: William Osler Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Ross Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Lindsay

HOSPITAL: Campbellford Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Campbellford

HOSPITAL: Cornwall Community Hospital
LOCATION: Cornwall

HOSPITAL: Norfolk General Hospital
LOCATION: Simcoe

HOSPITAL: Peterborough Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Peterborough

HOSPITAL: Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Orillia

HOSPITAL: Lake of the Woods District Hospital
LOCATION: Kenora

HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners
LOCATION: Mississauga

HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital
LOCATION: Mississauga

HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners Queensway Health Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: S.G. Bruni Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 06 Jul 2018
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Bruni (CPSO#: 97842 )
Business Address: Trillium Health Partners
Department of Radiology
100 Queensway West
Mississauga Ontario L5B 1B8
(905) 848-7100
Business Address: Credit Valley Hospital
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga Ontario L5M 2N1
Business Address: Queensway Health Center
150 Sherway Drive
Mississauga Ontario M9C 1A5

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Queen's University, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Trillium Health Partners
Department of Radiology
100 Queensway W
Mississauga Ontario L5B 1B8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9058487580
Extension: 7522
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 30 Jun 2017
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Prince Edward Island

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Lakeridge Health Oshawa
William Osler Health System Toronto
Ross Memorial Hospital Lindsay
Campbellford Memorial Hospital Campbellford
Cornwall Community Hospital Cornwall
Norfolk General Hospital Simcoe
Peterborough Regional Health Centre Peterborough
Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital Orillia
Lake of the Woods District Hospital Kenora
Trillium Health Partners Mississauga
Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga
Trillium Health Partners Queensway Health Centre Toronto
HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health
LOCATION: Oshawa

HOSPITAL: William Osler Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Ross Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Lindsay

HOSPITAL: Campbellford Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Campbellford

HOSPITAL: Cornwall Community Hospital
LOCATION: Cornwall

HOSPITAL: Norfolk General Hospital
LOCATION: Simcoe

HOSPITAL: Peterborough Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Peterborough

HOSPITAL: Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Orillia

HOSPITAL: Lake of the Woods District Hospital
LOCATION: Kenora

HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners
LOCATION: Mississauga

HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital
LOCATION: Mississauga

HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners Queensway Health Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: S.G. Bruni Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 06 Jul 2018
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Bruni (CPSO#: 97842 )
Business Address: Trillium Health Partners
Department of Radiology
100 Queensway West
Mississauga Ontario L5B 1B8
(905) 848-7100
Business Address: Credit Valley Hospital
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga Ontario L5M 2N1
Business Address: Queensway Health Center
150 Sherway Drive
Mississauga Ontario M9C 1A5

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SILVIO GIANCARLO BRUNI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BRUNI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SILVIO GIANCARLO BRUNI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BRUNI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 2012

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Mar 2018
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2017
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 29 Mar 2018

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2017

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2012