THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
06/05/25 03:16:40 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 2012
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Markham Fertility Centre
5th floor
379 Church Street
Markham Ontario L6B 0T1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-201-3414
Fax: 905-201-3414

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Gynecologic Reproductive Endocrinology/Infertility
Effective: 24 Sep 2019
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 30 Jun 2017
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Gynecologic Reproductive Endocrinology/Infertility
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 24 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Oak Valley Health Markham
HOSPITAL: Oak Valley Health
LOCATION: Markham

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Marta Wais Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 25 Jul 2019
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Wais (CPSO#: 97844 )
Business Address: Markham Fertility Centre
5th Floor
379 Church Street
Markham Ontario L6B 0T1

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Queen's University, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Markham Fertility Centre
5th floor
379 Church Street
Markham Ontario L6B 0T1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-201-3414
Fax: 905-201-3414

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Gynecologic Reproductive Endocrinology/Infertility
Effective: 24 Sep 2019
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 30 Jun 2017
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Gynecologic Reproductive Endocrinology/Infertility
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 24 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Oak Valley Health Markham
HOSPITAL: Oak Valley Health
LOCATION: Markham

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Marta Wais Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 25 Jul 2019
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Wais (CPSO#: 97844 )
Business Address: Markham Fertility Centre
5th Floor
379 Church Street
Markham Ontario L6B 0T1

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARTA EWA WAIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WAIS is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARTA EWA WAIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WAIS is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 2012

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2017
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2017

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2012