THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
01/05/25 04:07:52 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 2012
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Women's Health in Women's Hands
Suite 500
2 Carlton Street
Toronto Ontario M5B 1J3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 593-7655
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Jessie's Centre
c/o Inner City Health Associates
59 Adelaide St. E, 2nd Floor
Toronto Ontario M5C 1K6
Phone: 416 591 4411
Fax: 416 640 2072

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 18 Jun 2014
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 18 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: St Michael's Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: J. Rana Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 Oct 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Rana (CPSO#: 97849 )
Business Address: Unit 500
2 Carlton Street
Toronto Ontario M5B 1J3
(416) 593-7655
Business Address: 205 Parliament Street
Toronto Ontario M5A 2Z4
(416) 365-1888

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Queen's University, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Women's Health in Women's Hands
Suite 500
2 Carlton Street
Toronto Ontario M5B 1J3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 593-7655
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Jessie's Centre
c/o Inner City Health Associates
59 Adelaide St. E, 2nd Floor
Toronto Ontario M5C 1K6
Phone: 416 591 4411
Fax: 416 640 2072

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 18 Jun 2014
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 18 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: St Michael's Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: J. Rana Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 Oct 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Rana (CPSO#: 97849 )
Business Address: Unit 500
2 Carlton Street
Toronto Ontario M5B 1J3
(416) 593-7655
Business Address: 205 Parliament Street
Toronto Ontario M5A 2Z4
(416) 365-1888

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JESLEEN KAUR RANA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RANA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JESLEEN KAUR RANA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RANA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 2012

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 2014
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Jun 2014

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2012