THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
18/05/25 04:14:27 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Cebu Institute of Medicine, 2011
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2200 Eglinton Ave W
Credit Valley Hospital
Division of Genetics
Rm 1A100
Mississauga ON L5M 2N1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Medical Genetics and Genomics
Effective: 30 Jun 2017
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Medical Genetics and Genomics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - New York

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital
LOCATION: Mississauga

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: P.G.R. SINAJON MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 25 Jun 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Sinajon (CPSO#: 97859 )
Business Address: 2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Credit Valley Hospital
Division of Genetics
Rm 1A100
Mississauga Ontario L5M 2N1

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Cebu Institute of Medicine, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2200 Eglinton Ave W
Credit Valley Hospital
Division of Genetics
Rm 1A100
Mississauga ON L5M 2N1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Medical Genetics and Genomics
Effective: 30 Jun 2017
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Medical Genetics and Genomics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - New York

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital
LOCATION: Mississauga

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: P.G.R. SINAJON MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 25 Jun 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Sinajon (CPSO#: 97859 )
Business Address: 2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Credit Valley Hospital
Division of Genetics
Rm 1A100
Mississauga Ontario L5M 2N1

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PIERRE GENE ROMULO SINAJON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SINAJON is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PIERRE GENE ROMULO SINAJON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SINAJON is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Cebu Institute of Medicine, 2011

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Feb 2019
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2012
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Feb 2019

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Sep 2012

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2012