THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
01/05/25 04:03:40 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2012
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, FARSI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Markham Stouffville Hospital
Department of Emergency Medicine
381 Church Street
Markham Ontario L3P 7P3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 472-7000
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 22 Dec 2015
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 18 Jun 2014
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 22 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 18 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Oak Valley Health Markham
HOSPITAL: Oak Valley Health
LOCATION: Markham

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Nima Soudi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Sep 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Soudi (CPSO#: 97863 )
Business Address: Markham Stouffville Hospital
Department of Emergency Medicine
381 Church Street
Markham Ontario L3P 7P3
(905) 472-7000

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, FARSI
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Markham Stouffville Hospital
Department of Emergency Medicine
381 Church Street
Markham Ontario L3P 7P3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 472-7000
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 22 Dec 2015
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 18 Jun 2014
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 22 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 18 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Oak Valley Health Markham
HOSPITAL: Oak Valley Health
LOCATION: Markham

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Nima Soudi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Sep 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Soudi (CPSO#: 97863 )
Business Address: Markham Stouffville Hospital
Department of Emergency Medicine
381 Church Street
Markham Ontario L3P 7P3
(905) 472-7000

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NIMA SOUDI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SOUDI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NIMA SOUDI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SOUDI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2012

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Apr 2015
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Apr 2015

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2012