THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
07/05/25 03:34:58 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2012
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: The Hospital for Sick Children
Department of Paediatrics
555 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4168131500
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatric Emergency Medicine
Effective: 27 Sep 2017
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Pediatrics
Effective: 30 Jun 2016
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatric Emergency Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 27 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital
LOCATION: Brampton

HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Hospital For Sick Children
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Elana Hochstadter Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Dec 2018
Shareholders:
Dr. E. Hochstadter (CPSO#: 97873 )
Business Address: The Hospital for Sick Children
Pediatric Emergency
555 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X5
(647) 680-5018

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: The Hospital for Sick Children
Department of Paediatrics
555 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4168131500
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatric Emergency Medicine
Effective: 27 Sep 2017
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Pediatrics
Effective: 30 Jun 2016
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatric Emergency Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 27 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital
LOCATION: Brampton

HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Hospital For Sick Children
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Elana Hochstadter Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Dec 2018
Shareholders:
Dr. E. Hochstadter (CPSO#: 97873 )
Business Address: The Hospital for Sick Children
Pediatric Emergency
555 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X5
(647) 680-5018

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ELANA FAY HOCHSTADTER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HOCHSTADTER is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ELANA FAY HOCHSTADTER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HOCHSTADTER is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2012

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Sep 2016
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 09 Sep 2016

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2012