THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:44:41 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2012
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, POLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 4270 Innes Road
Ottawa Ontario K4A5E6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 841-7009
Fax: 613-841-0106
Address: Division of Endocrinology
The Ottawa Hospital - Riverside
1967 Riverside Dr.
4th Floor
Ottawa Ontario K1H 7W9
Phone: 613-738-8400
Extension: 88333
Fax: 613-738-8327

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Endocrinology and Metabolism
Effective: 26 Sep 2018
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 14 Dec 2016
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Endocrinology and Metabolism
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 26 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 14 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Queensway Carleton Hospital Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Queensway Carleton Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Irena Druce Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 06 Apr 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. I. Druce (CPSO#: 97879 )
Business Address: 4270 Innes Rd 6138417009

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, POLISH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 4270 Innes Road
Ottawa Ontario K4A5E6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 841-7009
Fax: 613-841-0106
Address: Division of Endocrinology
The Ottawa Hospital - Riverside
1967 Riverside Dr.
4th Floor
Ottawa Ontario K1H 7W9
Phone: 613-738-8400
Extension: 88333
Fax: 613-738-8327

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Endocrinology and Metabolism
Effective: 26 Sep 2018
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 14 Dec 2016
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Endocrinology and Metabolism
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 26 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 14 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Queensway Carleton Hospital Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Queensway Carleton Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Irena Druce Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 06 Apr 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. I. Druce (CPSO#: 97879 )
Business Address: 4270 Innes Rd 6138417009

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. IRENA DRUCE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DRUCE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. IRENA DRUCE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DRUCE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2012

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Oct 2017
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Oct 2017

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2012