THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
02/05/25 04:25:38 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2012
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2081 Laval Street
Clarence-Rockland Ontario K0A 1E0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 487-1802
Extension: 2235
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 23 Jun 2014
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 23 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Patients seeking a copy of their medical record can contact the Prince Edward County Family Health Team at: 613-476-0400, 35 Bridge Street, Prince Edward, ON., K0K 2T0
Date Received: 02 Mar 2022

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Quinte Healthcare Prince Edward Site Picton
HOSPITAL: Quinte Healthcare Prince Edward Site
LOCATION: Picton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Tarik Eldjama Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Jun 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. T. Eldjama (CPSO#: 97902 )
Business Address: 155 Cresthaven Dr
Nepean ON K2G 6T2
Business Address: 19 Macstevens Drive
Picton Ontario K0K 2T0
Business Address: Harbourview Clinic
Suite 4
35 Bridge Street
Picton Ontario K0K 2T0
(613) 476-3008
Business Address: 155 Cresthaven Dr
Nepean ON K2G 6T2
Business Address: 275 Slater St
unit 20
Ottawa ON K1P 5H9

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2081 Laval Street
Clarence-Rockland Ontario K0A 1E0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 487-1802
Extension: 2235
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 23 Jun 2014
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 23 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Patients seeking a copy of their medical record can contact the Prince Edward County Family Health Team at: 613-476-0400, 35 Bridge Street, Prince Edward, ON., K0K 2T0
Date Received: 02 Mar 2022

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Quinte Healthcare Prince Edward Site Picton
HOSPITAL: Quinte Healthcare Prince Edward Site
LOCATION: Picton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Tarik Eldjama Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Jun 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. T. Eldjama (CPSO#: 97902 )
Business Address: 155 Cresthaven Dr
Nepean ON K2G 6T2
Business Address: 19 Macstevens Drive
Picton Ontario K0K 2T0
Business Address: Harbourview Clinic
Suite 4
35 Bridge Street
Picton Ontario K0K 2T0
(613) 476-3008
Business Address: 155 Cresthaven Dr
Nepean ON K2G 6T2
Business Address: 275 Slater St
unit 20
Ottawa ON K1P 5H9

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. TARIK ELDJAMA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ELDJAMA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. TARIK ELDJAMA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ELDJAMA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2012

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 2014
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Jun 2014

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2012