THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:07:30 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: American University Of Antigua, 2008
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, YORUBA

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Albany Medical Clinic
807 Broadview Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4K 2P8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 461-9471
Fax: (416) 461-2710
Address: 138 Dowling Ave
Toronto ON M6K 3A6
Phone: 4165337935
Fax: No Information Available
Address: A-819 Queen St W
Toronto ON M6J 1G1
Phone: 4162146337
Fax: 4162146334
Address: Nisbet Lodge
740 Pape Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4K 3S7
Phone: (416) 469-1105
Fax: (416) 469-2996
Address: Castleview Wychwood Towers
351 Christie street
Toronto Ontario M6G 3C3
Phone: (416) 392-5763
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 2701 St.Clair Ave, East
Toronto Ontario M4B 3M3
Phone: (416) 757-8757
Extension: 230
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 14 Jun 2012
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 14 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Abo Akintan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 06 Jul 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Akintan (CPSO#: 97910 )
Business Address: Castleview Wychwood Towers
351 Christie Street
Toronto Ontario M6G 3C3
(416) 392-5763
Business Address: 2701 St. Clair Avenue East
Toronto Ontario M4B 1M5
(416) 757-8757
Business Address: Albany Medical Clinic
Room 464
807 Broadview Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4K 2P8
(416) 461-9471
Business Address: Nisbet Lodge
740 Pape Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4K 3T1
(416) 469-1105
Business Address: 138 Dowling Ave
Toronto ON M6K 3A6
4165337935

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, YORUBA
Medical School: American University Of Antigua, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Albany Medical Clinic
807 Broadview Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4K 2P8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 461-9471
Fax: (416) 461-2710
Address: 138 Dowling Ave
Toronto ON M6K 3A6
Phone: 4165337935
Fax: No Information Available
Address: A-819 Queen St W
Toronto ON M6J 1G1
Phone: 4162146337
Fax: 4162146334
Address: Nisbet Lodge
740 Pape Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4K 3S7
Phone: (416) 469-1105
Fax: (416) 469-2996
Address: Castleview Wychwood Towers
351 Christie street
Toronto Ontario M6G 3C3
Phone: (416) 392-5763
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 2701 St.Clair Ave, East
Toronto Ontario M4B 3M3
Phone: (416) 757-8757
Extension: 230
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 14 Jun 2012
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 14 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Abo Akintan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 06 Jul 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Akintan (CPSO#: 97910 )
Business Address: Castleview Wychwood Towers
351 Christie Street
Toronto Ontario M6G 3C3
(416) 392-5763
Business Address: 2701 St. Clair Avenue East
Toronto Ontario M4B 1M5
(416) 757-8757
Business Address: Albany Medical Clinic
Room 464
807 Broadview Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4K 2P8
(416) 461-9471
Business Address: Nisbet Lodge
740 Pape Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4K 3T1
(416) 469-1105
Business Address: 138 Dowling Ave
Toronto ON M6K 3A6
4165337935

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
17 Oct 2013
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Oct 17 2013
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Abosede Akintan may practise medicine independently in family medicine,
only.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Abosede Akintan may practise medicine independently in family medicine,
only.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: American University Of Antigua, 2008

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 17 Oct 2013
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 17 Oct 2013
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 2012
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 17 Oct 2013

DETAILS: Expiry date removed from certificate of registration.
Date: Effective: 17 Oct 2013

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 Jun 2012
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 14 Jun 2012