THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
30/04/25 03:54:21 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2012
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Stonechurch Family Health Centre
1475 Upper Ottawa Street
Hamilton Ontario L8W 3J6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905)574-1444
Fax: (905)575-9892

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 08 Jan 2015
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 08 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences General Site
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Erin Gallagher Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 29 Jun 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. E. Gallagher (CPSO#: 97916 )
Business Address: 1475 Upper Ottawa Street
Hamilton Ontario L8W 3J6

Corporation Name: Erin Gallagher Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 30 May 2021

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Stonechurch Family Health Centre
1475 Upper Ottawa Street
Hamilton Ontario L8W 3J6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905)574-1444
Fax: (905)575-9892

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 08 Jan 2015
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 08 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences General Site
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Erin Gallagher Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 29 Jun 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. E. Gallagher (CPSO#: 97916 )
Business Address: 1475 Upper Ottawa Street
Hamilton Ontario L8W 3J6

Corporation Name: Erin Gallagher Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 30 May 2021

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ERIN ELISABETH GALLAGHER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GALLAGHER is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ERIN ELISABETH GALLAGHER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GALLAGHER is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2012

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Feb 2016
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 10 Feb 2016

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2012