THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:02:06 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2012
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 104-300G Fourth Ave
St. Catharines ON L2S 0E6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9056844364
Fax: 905 684 4466

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Orthopedic Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2017
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Orthopedic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Niagara Health System Ontario Street Site St Catharines
HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System Ontario Street Site
LOCATION: St Catharines

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Prateek Goyal Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 Sep 2018
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Goyal (CPSO#: 97919 )
Business Address: 547 Glenridge Avenue
St Catharines Ontario L2T 4C2
(905) 684-4364
Business Address: 300G Fourth Avenue
Unit 104
St. Catharines Ontario L2S 0E6

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 104-300G Fourth Ave
St. Catharines ON L2S 0E6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9056844364
Fax: 905 684 4466

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Orthopedic Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2017
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Orthopedic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Niagara Health System Ontario Street Site St Catharines
HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System Ontario Street Site
LOCATION: St Catharines

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Prateek Goyal Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 Sep 2018
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Goyal (CPSO#: 97919 )
Business Address: 547 Glenridge Avenue
St Catharines Ontario L2T 4C2
(905) 684-4364
Business Address: 300G Fourth Avenue
Unit 104
St. Catharines Ontario L2S 0E6

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PRATEEK GOYAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GOYAL is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PRATEEK GOYAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GOYAL is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2012

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Feb 2018
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2017
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Feb 2018

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2017

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2012