THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:40:27 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Manitoba, 2012
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: St. Michael's Hospital
Division of Neurosurgery
30 Bond St
Toronto Ontario M5B 1W8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 864-5060
Fax: (416) 864-3090

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Neurosurgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2018
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Neurosurgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Health Centre Toronto Toronto
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Centre Toronto
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: St Michael's Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Christopher D. Witiw Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 13 Jun 2019
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Witiw (CPSO#: 97954 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Manitoba, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: St. Michael's Hospital
Division of Neurosurgery
30 Bond St
Toronto Ontario M5B 1W8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 864-5060
Fax: (416) 864-3090

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Neurosurgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2018
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Neurosurgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Health Centre Toronto Toronto
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Centre Toronto
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: St Michael's Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Christopher D. Witiw Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 13 Jun 2019
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Witiw (CPSO#: 97954 )

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CHRISTOPHER DANIEL WITIW may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WITIW is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CHRISTOPHER DANIEL WITIW may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WITIW is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Manitoba, 2012

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 May 2019
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2018
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 08 May 2019

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2018

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2012