THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
23/05/25 03:33:08 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Manitoba, 2012
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 300-3 Charles St W
Toronto ON M4Y 1R4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 926-2740
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Oak Ridges Medical Centre
Suite 101
13291 Yonge Street
Richmond Hill Ontario L4E 4L6
Phone: (905) 773-7759
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 18 Jun 2014
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 18 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - British Columbia

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Llewellyn Surajballi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Aug 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Surajballi (CPSO#: 97960 )
Business Address: Oak Ridges Medical Centre
Suite 100
13291 Yonge Street
Richmond Hill Ontario L4E 4L6
(905) 773-7759
Business Address: 300-3 Charles St W
The Health Clinic by Shoppers
3rd Floor Suite
Toronto ON M4Y 1R4
(416) 926-2740

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Manitoba, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 300-3 Charles St W
Toronto ON M4Y 1R4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 926-2740
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Oak Ridges Medical Centre
Suite 101
13291 Yonge Street
Richmond Hill Ontario L4E 4L6
Phone: (905) 773-7759
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 18 Jun 2014
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 18 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - British Columbia

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Llewellyn Surajballi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Aug 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Surajballi (CPSO#: 97960 )
Business Address: Oak Ridges Medical Centre
Suite 100
13291 Yonge Street
Richmond Hill Ontario L4E 4L6
(905) 773-7759
Business Address: 300-3 Charles St W
The Health Clinic by Shoppers
3rd Floor Suite
Toronto ON M4Y 1R4
(416) 926-2740

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LLEWELLYN SURAJBALLI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SURAJBALLI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LLEWELLYN SURAJBALLI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SURAJBALLI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Manitoba, 2012

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jul 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2014
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Jul 2014

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2014

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2012