THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
14/05/25 03:08:41 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 2012
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Owen Sound Medical Centre
Suite 2000 and 3000
1415 First Avenue West
Owen Sound Ontario N4K 4K8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 470-3030
Fax: 519-370-4042

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 23 Jun 2014
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 23 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Grey Bruce Health Services Owen Sound Owen Sound
HOSPITAL: Grey Bruce Health Services Owen Sound
LOCATION: Owen Sound

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Mark W. Robertson Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 27 Jun 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Robertson (CPSO#: 97967 )
Business Address: Owen Sound Medical Centre
Suite 2000
1415 1st Avenue West
Owen Sound Ontario N4K 4K8
(519) 470-3030

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Owen Sound Medical Centre
Suite 2000 and 3000
1415 First Avenue West
Owen Sound Ontario N4K 4K8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 470-3030
Fax: 519-370-4042

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 23 Jun 2014
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 23 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Grey Bruce Health Services Owen Sound Owen Sound
HOSPITAL: Grey Bruce Health Services Owen Sound
LOCATION: Owen Sound

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Mark W. Robertson Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 27 Jun 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Robertson (CPSO#: 97967 )
Business Address: Owen Sound Medical Centre
Suite 2000
1415 1st Avenue West
Owen Sound Ontario N4K 4K8
(519) 470-3030

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARK WILLIAM ROBERTSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROBERTSON is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARK WILLIAM ROBERTSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROBERTSON is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 2012

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 2014
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 26 Jun 2014

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2012