THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:00:59 AM

General Information

Former Name: Vale, Kayla (Used Until: 06 Sep 2016)
Medical School: McMaster University, 2012
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: GSH - Annex Clinic
Second Floor
481 Bloor St W
Toronto Ontario M5S 1X9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 928-0217
Fax: (416) 964-1815

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 23 Jun 2014
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 23 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Kayla Walderman Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 Jul 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Walderman (CPSO#: 97981 )
Business Address: East Liberty Medical Centre
Suite 105
901 King Street West
Toronto Ontario M5V 3H5
(416) 599-6000
Business Address: GSH - Annex Clinic
2nd Floor
481 Boor Street West
Toronto Ontario M5S 1X9
(416) 928-0217

General Information

Former Name: Vale, Kayla (Used Until: 06 Sep 2016)
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: GSH - Annex Clinic
Second Floor
481 Bloor St W
Toronto Ontario M5S 1X9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 928-0217
Fax: (416) 964-1815

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 23 Jun 2014
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 23 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Kayla Walderman Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 Jul 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Walderman (CPSO#: 97981 )
Business Address: East Liberty Medical Centre
Suite 105
901 King Street West
Toronto Ontario M5V 3H5
(416) 599-6000
Business Address: GSH - Annex Clinic
2nd Floor
481 Boor Street West
Toronto Ontario M5S 1X9
(416) 928-0217

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KAYLA WALDERMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WALDERMAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KAYLA WALDERMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WALDERMAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2012

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 2014
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Jun 2014

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2012