THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
01/05/25 04:40:58 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2012
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1280 Main St. W
3A-80
Hamilton Ontario L8S 4K1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-521-2100
Fax: 905-521-4968

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Rheumatology
Effective: 24 Oct 2017
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Pediatrics
Effective: 30 Jun 2016
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Rheumatology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 24 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: L. D. Heale Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 Nov 2018
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Heale (CPSO#: 98000 )
Business Address: 3A-74
1280 Main Street West
Hamilton Ontario L8S 4K1
(905) 521-2100

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1280 Main St. W
3A-80
Hamilton Ontario L8S 4K1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-521-2100
Fax: 905-521-4968

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Rheumatology
Effective: 24 Oct 2017
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Pediatrics
Effective: 30 Jun 2016
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Rheumatology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 24 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: L. D. Heale Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 Nov 2018
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Heale (CPSO#: 98000 )
Business Address: 3A-74
1280 Main Street West
Hamilton Ontario L8S 4K1
(905) 521-2100

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LIANE DOREEN HEALE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HEALE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LIANE DOREEN HEALE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HEALE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2012

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Oct 2016
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Oct 2016

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2012