THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
30/04/25 04:42:57 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2012
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2462 Howard Avenue
suite 200
Windsor Ontario N8X 3V7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 5199463361
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Windsor Regional Hospital
1995 Lens Avenue
Windsor Ontario N8W 1L9
Phone: (519) 254-5577
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 19 Jun 2014
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 19 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Alberta

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Erie Shores Healthcare Leamington
Windsor Regional Hospital Windsor
HOSPITAL: Erie Shores Healthcare
LOCATION: Leamington

HOSPITAL: Windsor Regional Hospital
LOCATION: Windsor

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Craig Campagna Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 09 Aug 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Campagna (CPSO#: 98027 )
Business Address: 2462 Howard Avenue
Unit 113
Windsor Ontario N8X 3V6
(519) 946-3361
Business Address: 1995 Lens Avenue
Windsor Ontario N8W 1L9

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2462 Howard Avenue
suite 200
Windsor Ontario N8X 3V7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 5199463361
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Windsor Regional Hospital
1995 Lens Avenue
Windsor Ontario N8W 1L9
Phone: (519) 254-5577
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 19 Jun 2014
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 19 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Alberta

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Erie Shores Healthcare Leamington
Windsor Regional Hospital Windsor
HOSPITAL: Erie Shores Healthcare
LOCATION: Leamington

HOSPITAL: Windsor Regional Hospital
LOCATION: Windsor

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Craig Campagna Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 09 Aug 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Campagna (CPSO#: 98027 )
Business Address: 2462 Howard Avenue
Unit 113
Windsor Ontario N8X 3V6
(519) 946-3361
Business Address: 1995 Lens Avenue
Windsor Ontario N8W 1L9

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CRAIG CAMPAGNA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CAMPAGNA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CRAIG CAMPAGNA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CAMPAGNA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2012

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 2014
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Jun 2014

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2012