THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
30/04/25 04:47:01 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2012
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 10350 Yonge Street
Suite 002
Richmond Hill Ontario L4C 5K9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-479-0892
Fax: 416-479-0003
Address: 6 Harvey St
Chatham ON N7M 1L6
Phone: (888) 930-6571
Fax: (855) 967-2945

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 15 Oct 2018
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 16 Dec 2014
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 15 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 16 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Oak Valley Health Markham
Humber River Hospital Toronto
Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare Bracebridge
HOSPITAL: Oak Valley Health
LOCATION: Markham

HOSPITAL: Humber River Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare
LOCATION: Bracebridge

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Eli Miller Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 29 Jan 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. E. Miller (CPSO#: 98046 )
Business Address: 10350 Yonge Street
Suite 002
Richmond Hill Ontario L4C 5K9

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 10350 Yonge Street
Suite 002
Richmond Hill Ontario L4C 5K9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-479-0892
Fax: 416-479-0003
Address: 6 Harvey St
Chatham ON N7M 1L6
Phone: (888) 930-6571
Fax: (855) 967-2945

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 15 Oct 2018
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 16 Dec 2014
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 15 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 16 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Oak Valley Health Markham
Humber River Hospital Toronto
Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare Bracebridge
HOSPITAL: Oak Valley Health
LOCATION: Markham

HOSPITAL: Humber River Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare
LOCATION: Bracebridge

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Eli Miller Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 29 Jan 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. E. Miller (CPSO#: 98046 )
Business Address: 10350 Yonge Street
Suite 002
Richmond Hill Ontario L4C 5K9

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ELI MILLER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MILLER is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ELI MILLER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MILLER is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2012

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jan 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2014
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 Jan 2015

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2014

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2012