THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
14/05/25 05:06:25 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2012
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: St Thomas Elgin General Hospital
189 Elm Street
St Thomas Ontario N5R 5C4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 631-2030
Extension: 2047
Fax: (519) 637-3218

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 22 Dec 2015
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 21 Oct 2014
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 22 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 21 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Thomas-Elgin General Hospital St Thomas
HOSPITAL: St Thomas-Elgin General Hospital
LOCATION: St Thomas

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Lance Miller Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 27 Sep 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Miller (CPSO#: 98056 )
Business Address: 189 Elm St
St Thomas ON N5R 5C4
5196312030 Extn: 2047

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: St Thomas Elgin General Hospital
189 Elm Street
St Thomas Ontario N5R 5C4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 631-2030
Extension: 2047
Fax: (519) 637-3218

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 22 Dec 2015
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 21 Oct 2014
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 22 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 21 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Thomas-Elgin General Hospital St Thomas
HOSPITAL: St Thomas-Elgin General Hospital
LOCATION: St Thomas

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Lance Miller Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 27 Sep 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Miller (CPSO#: 98056 )
Business Address: 189 Elm St
St Thomas ON N5R 5C4
5196312030 Extn: 2047

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LANCE STEPHEN MILLER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MILLER is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LANCE STEPHEN MILLER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MILLER is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2012

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Apr 2015
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 Apr 2015

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2012