THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
24/05/25 04:34:40 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2012
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 9600 Bathurst Street
Suite 300
Vaughan Ontario L6A 3Z8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 289-269-1522
Fax: 905-303-9774

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 27 Jan 2015
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 27 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Stevenson Memorial Hospital Alliston
HOSPITAL: Stevenson Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Alliston

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Karen J. Dobkin Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Dobkin (CPSO#: 98082 )
Business Address: 9600 Bathurst St
Suite 300
Vaughan ON L6A 3Z8

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 9600 Bathurst Street
Suite 300
Vaughan Ontario L6A 3Z8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 289-269-1522
Fax: 905-303-9774

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 27 Jan 2015
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 27 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Stevenson Memorial Hospital Alliston
HOSPITAL: Stevenson Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Alliston

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Karen J. Dobkin Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Dobkin (CPSO#: 98082 )
Business Address: 9600 Bathurst St
Suite 300
Vaughan ON L6A 3Z8

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KAREN JENNIFER DOBKIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DOBKIN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KAREN JENNIFER DOBKIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DOBKIN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2012

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Feb 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 01 Feb 2015
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 Feb 2015

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 01 Feb 2015

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2012