THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:44:08 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2012
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2525 Old Bronte Road
Oakville Ontario L6M 4J2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 289-386-3625
Fax: 289-386-3536

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Plastic Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2017
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Plastic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Oakville
HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation
LOCATION: Oakville

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. L. Willoughby Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Jun 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Willoughby (CPSO#: 98090 )
Business Address: 2525 Bronte Road
Suite 560
Oakville Ontario L6M 4J2
(289) 386-3625

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2525 Old Bronte Road
Oakville Ontario L6M 4J2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 289-386-3625
Fax: 289-386-3536

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Plastic Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2017
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Plastic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Oakville
HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation
LOCATION: Oakville

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. L. Willoughby Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Jun 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Willoughby (CPSO#: 98090 )
Business Address: 2525 Bronte Road
Suite 560
Oakville Ontario L6M 4J2
(289) 386-3625

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LAUREN IRENE WILLOUGHBY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WILLOUGHBY is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LAUREN IRENE WILLOUGHBY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WILLOUGHBY is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2012

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Oct 2018
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2017
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Oct 2018

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2017

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2012