THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:27:12 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2012
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Kingston Health Sciences Centre
Division of General Internal Med
94 Stuart Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 3N6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-533-2056
Fax: (613) 533-6654

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Internal Medicine
Effective: 26 Sep 2017
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2016
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 26 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
HOSPITAL: Kingston Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Kingston

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Stephen Gauthier Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Apr 2017
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Gauthier (CPSO#: 98098 )
Business Address: Kingston General Hospital
Suite 1018
94 Stuart Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 3N6

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Kingston Health Sciences Centre
Division of General Internal Med
94 Stuart Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 3N6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-533-2056
Fax: (613) 533-6654

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Internal Medicine
Effective: 26 Sep 2017
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2016
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 26 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
HOSPITAL: Kingston Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Kingston

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Stephen Gauthier Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Apr 2017
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Gauthier (CPSO#: 98098 )
Business Address: Kingston General Hospital
Suite 1018
94 Stuart Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 3N6

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. STEPHEN GAUTHIER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GAUTHIER is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. STEPHEN GAUTHIER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GAUTHIER is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2012

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2016
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2016

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2012