THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:35:58 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2012
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Royal Victoria Hospital
Family Medicine Teaching Unit
201 Georgian Drive
Barrie Ontario L4M 6M2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 792-3333
Fax: (705) 728-4120
Address: 829 Big Bay Point Road
Barrie Family Medicine Clinic
Unit D2
Barrie Ontario L4M 4S6
Phone: 705-722-1199
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 125 Bell Farm Road
Barrie Family Medicine Clinic
Suite 101
Barrie Ontario L4M 6L2
Phone: 705-722-1199
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 18 Jun 2014
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 18 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie
HOSPITAL: Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Barrie

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: M.V. Orava Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 Sep 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Orava (CPSO#: 98099 )
Business Address: Royal Victoria Hospital
Family Medicine Teaching Unit
201 Georgian Drive
Barrie Ontario L4M 6M2
(705) 792-3333

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Royal Victoria Hospital
Family Medicine Teaching Unit
201 Georgian Drive
Barrie Ontario L4M 6M2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 792-3333
Fax: (705) 728-4120
Address: 829 Big Bay Point Road
Barrie Family Medicine Clinic
Unit D2
Barrie Ontario L4M 4S6
Phone: 705-722-1199
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 125 Bell Farm Road
Barrie Family Medicine Clinic
Suite 101
Barrie Ontario L4M 6L2
Phone: 705-722-1199
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 18 Jun 2014
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 18 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie
HOSPITAL: Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Barrie

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: M.V. Orava Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 Sep 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Orava (CPSO#: 98099 )
Business Address: Royal Victoria Hospital
Family Medicine Teaching Unit
201 Georgian Drive
Barrie Ontario L4M 6M2
(705) 792-3333

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MATTHEW VICTOR ORAVA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ORAVA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MATTHEW VICTOR ORAVA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ORAVA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2012

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2014
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Jun 2014

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2012