THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
07/05/25 04:23:58 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2012
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Cambridge Memorial Hospital
700 Coronation Blvd
Cambridge Ontario N1R 3G2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 621-2330
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Critical Care Medicine
Effective: 27 Sep 2017
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2016
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Critical Care Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 27 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Grand River Hospital Corporation Kitchener
Guelph General Hospital Guelph
Cambridge Memorial Hospital Cambridge
HOSPITAL: Grand River Hospital Corporation
LOCATION: Kitchener

HOSPITAL: Guelph General Hospital
LOCATION: Guelph

HOSPITAL: Cambridge Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Cambridge

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. David Cape Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 14 Apr 2025

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Cambridge Memorial Hospital
700 Coronation Blvd
Cambridge Ontario N1R 3G2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 621-2330
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Critical Care Medicine
Effective: 27 Sep 2017
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2016
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Critical Care Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 27 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Grand River Hospital Corporation Kitchener
Guelph General Hospital Guelph
Cambridge Memorial Hospital Cambridge
HOSPITAL: Grand River Hospital Corporation
LOCATION: Kitchener

HOSPITAL: Guelph General Hospital
LOCATION: Guelph

HOSPITAL: Cambridge Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Cambridge

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. David Cape Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 14 Apr 2025

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DAVID LEE DILLON CAPE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CAPE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DAVID LEE DILLON CAPE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CAPE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2012

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2016
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2016

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2012