THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
12/05/25 05:11:34 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2012
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 399 Bathurst St
Toronto Western Hospital
8MP-327
Toronto ON M5T 2S8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-603-5949
Fax: 416-603-6204

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Gastroenterology
Effective: 03 Oct 2017
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2016
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Gastroenterology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 03 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Women's College Hospital Toronto
Sinai Health System Toronto
University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital Toronto
University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
HOSPITAL: Women's College Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: COLLEEN H. PARKER MEDICAL PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 25 May 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Parker (CPSO#: 98127 )
Business Address: 399 Bathurst Street
8MP-328
Toronto Ontario M5T 2S6
416-603-5949

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 399 Bathurst St
Toronto Western Hospital
8MP-327
Toronto ON M5T 2S8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-603-5949
Fax: 416-603-6204

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Gastroenterology
Effective: 03 Oct 2017
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2016
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Gastroenterology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 03 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Women's College Hospital Toronto
Sinai Health System Toronto
University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital Toronto
University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
HOSPITAL: Women's College Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: COLLEEN H. PARKER MEDICAL PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 25 May 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Parker (CPSO#: 98127 )
Business Address: 399 Bathurst Street
8MP-328
Toronto Ontario M5T 2S6
416-603-5949

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. COLLEEN HELEN PARKER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PARKER is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. COLLEEN HELEN PARKER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PARKER is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2012

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Dec 2016
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Dec 2016

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2012