THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
01/05/25 03:59:28 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2012
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 600-130 Merton St
House Calls
c/o SPRINT Senior Care
Toronto ON M4S 1A4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-481-5099
Fax: 416-481-2590

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 18 Jun 2014
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 18 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Eugenie Phan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Jan 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. E. Phan (CPSO#: 98129 )
Business Address: 140 Merton Street
2nd Floor
Toronto Ontario M4S 1A1
(416) 481-5099

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 600-130 Merton St
House Calls
c/o SPRINT Senior Care
Toronto ON M4S 1A4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-481-5099
Fax: 416-481-2590

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 18 Jun 2014
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 18 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Eugenie Phan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Jan 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. E. Phan (CPSO#: 98129 )
Business Address: 140 Merton Street
2nd Floor
Toronto Ontario M4S 1A1
(416) 481-5099

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. EUGENIE PHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PHAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. EUGENIE PHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PHAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2012

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 2014
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Jun 2014

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2012