THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
29/04/25 06:15:59 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2012
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CROATIAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 201-15 Mountain Ave S
Stoney Creek ON L8G 2V6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-662-7555
Fax: 905-549-5255

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Respirology
Effective: 06 Nov 2017
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2016
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Respirology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 06 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Woodstock Hospital Woodstock
Niagara Health System St Catharines General Site St Catharines
HOSPITAL: Woodstock Hospital
LOCATION: Woodstock

HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System St Catharines General Site
LOCATION: St Catharines

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Michael Mitar Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 Sep 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Mitar (CPSO#: 98141 )
Business Address: Niagara Health System
St Catharines General Hospital
1200 Fourth Avenue
St Catharines Ontario L2S 0A9
(905) 378-4647
Business Address: Suite 201
180 Vine Street South
St Catharines Ontario L8R 2A9
Business Address: 15 Mountain Avenue South
Suite 201
Hamilton Ontario L8G 2V6
(905) 639-3209

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CROATIAN
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 201-15 Mountain Ave S
Stoney Creek ON L8G 2V6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-662-7555
Fax: 905-549-5255

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Respirology
Effective: 06 Nov 2017
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2016
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Respirology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 06 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Woodstock Hospital Woodstock
Niagara Health System St Catharines General Site St Catharines
HOSPITAL: Woodstock Hospital
LOCATION: Woodstock

HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System St Catharines General Site
LOCATION: St Catharines

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Michael Mitar Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 Sep 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Mitar (CPSO#: 98141 )
Business Address: Niagara Health System
St Catharines General Hospital
1200 Fourth Avenue
St Catharines Ontario L2S 0A9
(905) 378-4647
Business Address: Suite 201
180 Vine Street South
St Catharines Ontario L8R 2A9
Business Address: 15 Mountain Avenue South
Suite 201
Hamilton Ontario L8G 2V6
(905) 639-3209

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MICHAEL DOMIN MITAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MITAR is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MICHAEL DOMIN MITAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MITAR is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2012

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2016
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2016

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2012