THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
07/05/25 03:55:25 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2012
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: unit 7-2120 Regent Street
Greater Sudbury Ontario P3E 3Z9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 705-885-9070
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Neurosurgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2018
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Neurosurgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Health Sciences North Sudbury
HOSPITAL: Health Sciences North
LOCATION: Sudbury

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Amparo Wolf Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 11 Jul 2019
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Wolf (CPSO#: 98147 )
Business Address: 201-2009 Long Lake Road
Sudbury Ontario P3E 6C3
(705) 522-0292
Business Address: 888 Regent St
suite 105
Sudbury ON P3E 6C6
705-806-2248

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: unit 7-2120 Regent Street
Greater Sudbury Ontario P3E 3Z9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 705-885-9070
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Neurosurgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2018
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Neurosurgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Health Sciences North Sudbury
HOSPITAL: Health Sciences North
LOCATION: Sudbury

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Amparo Wolf Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 11 Jul 2019
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Wolf (CPSO#: 98147 )
Business Address: 201-2009 Long Lake Road
Sudbury Ontario P3E 6C3
(705) 522-0292
Business Address: 888 Regent St
suite 105
Sudbury ON P3E 6C6
705-806-2248

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. AMPARO MYRELLE WOLF may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WOLF is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. AMPARO MYRELLE WOLF may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WOLF is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2012

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 May 2019
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2018
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 May 2019

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2018

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2012