THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
06/05/25 04:27:36 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2012
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 268 Main Street
Lucan Medical
Lucan Ontario N0M 2J0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519)227-1163
Fax: 519-227-1558

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 26 Jun 2014
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 26 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Laura Caria Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 02 Feb 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Caria (CPSO#: 98152 )
Business Address: 268 Main Street
Lucan Ontario N0M 2J0
(519) 227-1163

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 268 Main Street
Lucan Medical
Lucan Ontario N0M 2J0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519)227-1163
Fax: 519-227-1558

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 26 Jun 2014
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 26 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Laura Caria Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 02 Feb 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Caria (CPSO#: 98152 )
Business Address: 268 Main Street
Lucan Ontario N0M 2J0
(519) 227-1163

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LAURA BETTY ROSE CARIA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CARIA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LAURA BETTY ROSE CARIA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CARIA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2012

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jul 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2014
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 07 Jul 2014

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2014

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2012