THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
15/05/25 04:42:31 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2012
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Emergency Department
Credit Valley Hospital
Trillium Health Partners
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga Ontario L5M 2N1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 813-4530
Fax: (905) 813-4548
Address: Emergency Department
Mississauga Hospital
Trillium Health Partners
100 Queensway West
Mississauga Ontario L5B 1B8
Phone: (905) 848-7100
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Queensway Urgent Care
Trillium Health Partners
150 Sherway Drive
Toronto Ontario M9C 1A5
Phone: (416)-259-6671
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 22 Dec 2015
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 18 Jun 2014
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 22 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 18 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga
Trillium Health Partners Mississauga
Trillium Health Partners Queensway Health Centre Toronto
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital
LOCATION: Mississauga

HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners
LOCATION: Mississauga

HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners Queensway Health Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Phil Zhang Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 25 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Zhang (CPSO#: 98170 )
Business Address: Queensway Urgent Care
150 Sherway Drive
Toronto Ontario M9C 1A5
(416) 259-6671
Business Address: Trillium Health Partners
Credit Valley Hospital
Emergency Department
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga Ontario L5M 2N1
(905) 813-4530
Business Address: Mississauga Hospital
100 Queensway West
Mississauga Ontario L5B 1B8
(905) 848-7100

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Emergency Department
Credit Valley Hospital
Trillium Health Partners
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga Ontario L5M 2N1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 813-4530
Fax: (905) 813-4548
Address: Emergency Department
Mississauga Hospital
Trillium Health Partners
100 Queensway West
Mississauga Ontario L5B 1B8
Phone: (905) 848-7100
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Queensway Urgent Care
Trillium Health Partners
150 Sherway Drive
Toronto Ontario M9C 1A5
Phone: (416)-259-6671
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 22 Dec 2015
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 18 Jun 2014
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 22 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 18 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga
Trillium Health Partners Mississauga
Trillium Health Partners Queensway Health Centre Toronto
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital
LOCATION: Mississauga

HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners
LOCATION: Mississauga

HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners Queensway Health Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Phil Zhang Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 25 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Zhang (CPSO#: 98170 )
Business Address: Queensway Urgent Care
150 Sherway Drive
Toronto Ontario M9C 1A5
(416) 259-6671
Business Address: Trillium Health Partners
Credit Valley Hospital
Emergency Department
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga Ontario L5M 2N1
(905) 813-4530
Business Address: Mississauga Hospital
100 Queensway West
Mississauga Ontario L5B 1B8
(905) 848-7100

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PHIL XU ZHANG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZHANG is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PHIL XU ZHANG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZHANG is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2012

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jul 2014
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Jul 2014

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2012