THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
22/05/25 04:15:14 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2012
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 100 Queensway W
Mississauga Ontario L5B 1B8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 813-2200
Fax: 647 689 7150
Address: 2200 Eglinton Ave W
Mississauga Ontario L5M 2N1
Phone: 905-813-2200
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Clinical Pharmacology and Toxicology
Effective: 26 Sep 2017
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2016
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Clinical Pharmacology and Toxicology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 26 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Manitoba

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners Mississauga
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners
LOCATION: Mississauga

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jeffrey E Alfonsi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Alfonsi (CPSO#: 98180 )
Business Address: LHSC University Hospital
Room B9-122
339 Windermere Road
London Ontario N6A 5A5
(519) 663-3881
Business Address: 100 Queensway W
Trillium Health Partners
Department of Medicine
Mississauga ON L5B 1B8

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 100 Queensway W
Mississauga Ontario L5B 1B8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 813-2200
Fax: 647 689 7150
Address: 2200 Eglinton Ave W
Mississauga Ontario L5M 2N1
Phone: 905-813-2200
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Clinical Pharmacology and Toxicology
Effective: 26 Sep 2017
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2016
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Clinical Pharmacology and Toxicology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 26 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Manitoba

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners Mississauga
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners
LOCATION: Mississauga

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jeffrey E Alfonsi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Alfonsi (CPSO#: 98180 )
Business Address: LHSC University Hospital
Room B9-122
339 Windermere Road
London Ontario N6A 5A5
(519) 663-3881
Business Address: 100 Queensway W
Trillium Health Partners
Department of Medicine
Mississauga ON L5B 1B8

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JEFFREY EARNEST ALFONSI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALFONSI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JEFFREY EARNEST ALFONSI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALFONSI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2012

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2016
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2016

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2012