THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 04:19:38 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2012
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Headwaters Health Care Centre
100 Rolling Hills Drive
Orangeville Ontario L9W 4X9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 941-2410
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 19 Oct 2015
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 18 Jun 2014
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 19 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 18 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Brightshores Health System Owen Sound
St Joseph's General Hospital Elliot Lake Elliot Lake
Campbellford Memorial Hospital Campbellford
Grey Bruce Health Services Southampton Hospital Southampton
Hanover and District Hospital Hanover
Headwaters Health Care Centre Orangeville
HOSPITAL: Brightshores Health System
LOCATION: Owen Sound

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's General Hospital Elliot Lake
LOCATION: Elliot Lake

HOSPITAL: Campbellford Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Campbellford

HOSPITAL: Grey Bruce Health Services Southampton Hospital
LOCATION: Southampton

HOSPITAL: Hanover and District Hospital
LOCATION: Hanover

HOSPITAL: Headwaters Health Care Centre
LOCATION: Orangeville

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Sarah Faria Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 08 Jun 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Faria (CPSO#: 98184 )
Business Address: Headwaters Healthcare Centre
100 Rolling Hills Drive
Orangeville Ontario L9W 4X9
(519) 941-2410

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Headwaters Health Care Centre
100 Rolling Hills Drive
Orangeville Ontario L9W 4X9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 941-2410
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 19 Oct 2015
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 18 Jun 2014
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 19 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 18 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Brightshores Health System Owen Sound
St Joseph's General Hospital Elliot Lake Elliot Lake
Campbellford Memorial Hospital Campbellford
Grey Bruce Health Services Southampton Hospital Southampton
Hanover and District Hospital Hanover
Headwaters Health Care Centre Orangeville
HOSPITAL: Brightshores Health System
LOCATION: Owen Sound

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's General Hospital Elliot Lake
LOCATION: Elliot Lake

HOSPITAL: Campbellford Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Campbellford

HOSPITAL: Grey Bruce Health Services Southampton Hospital
LOCATION: Southampton

HOSPITAL: Hanover and District Hospital
LOCATION: Hanover

HOSPITAL: Headwaters Health Care Centre
LOCATION: Orangeville

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Sarah Faria Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 08 Jun 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Faria (CPSO#: 98184 )
Business Address: Headwaters Healthcare Centre
100 Rolling Hills Drive
Orangeville Ontario L9W 4X9
(519) 941-2410

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SARAH NICOLE FARIA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FARIA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SARAH NICOLE FARIA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FARIA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2012

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Feb 2015
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Feb 2015

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2012