THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
06/05/25 09:03:39 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2012
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
2075 Bayview Avenue, FG-26
Toronto Ontario M4N 3M5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 480-4216
Fax: (416) 480-4613

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Neurology
Effective: 30 Jun 2017
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Neurology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Burke and Sediqzadah Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Aug 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Sediqzadah (CPSO#: 105885 ) Dr. M. Burke (CPSO#: 98188 )
Business Address: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
2075 Bayview Avenue
FG-26
Toronto Ontario M4N 3M5
(416) 480-4216
Business Address: St. Michael's Hospital
Department of Psychiatry
30 Bond Street
17th Floor
Toronto Ontario M5B 1W8
(416) 864-3088

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
2075 Bayview Avenue, FG-26
Toronto Ontario M4N 3M5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 480-4216
Fax: (416) 480-4613

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Neurology
Effective: 30 Jun 2017
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Neurology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Burke and Sediqzadah Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Aug 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Sediqzadah (CPSO#: 105885 ) Dr. M. Burke (CPSO#: 98188 )
Business Address: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
2075 Bayview Avenue
FG-26
Toronto Ontario M4N 3M5
(416) 480-4216
Business Address: St. Michael's Hospital
Department of Psychiatry
30 Bond Street
17th Floor
Toronto Ontario M5B 1W8
(416) 864-3088

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MATTHEW JAMES MAGNUS BURKE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BURKE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MATTHEW JAMES MAGNUS BURKE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BURKE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2012

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 2019
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2017
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Jun 2019

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2017

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2012