THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:49:14 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Institute Medicine,Pharmacy,Tirgu-Mures, 2004
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HUNGARIAN, ROMANIAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: University Health Network
Toronto Western Hospital
399 Bathurst Street
8-320, Main Pavilion
Toronto Ontario M5T 2S8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-603-6297
Fax: 416-603-6458

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2019
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. ANDRAS B. FECSO MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Dec 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Fecso (CPSO#: 98219 )
Business Address: 399 Bathurst St
8-MP-320
Toronto ON M5T 2S8
Business Address: 601-340 College St
Toronto ON M5T 3A9

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HUNGARIAN, ROMANIAN
Medical School: Institute Medicine,Pharmacy,Tirgu-Mures, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: University Health Network
Toronto Western Hospital
399 Bathurst Street
8-320, Main Pavilion
Toronto Ontario M5T 2S8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-603-6297
Fax: 416-603-6458

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2019
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. ANDRAS B. FECSO MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Dec 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Fecso (CPSO#: 98219 )
Business Address: 399 Bathurst St
8-MP-320
Toronto ON M5T 2S8
Business Address: 601-340 College St
Toronto ON M5T 3A9

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANDRAS BOTOND FECSO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FECSO is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANDRAS BOTOND FECSO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FECSO is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Institute Medicine,Pharmacy,Tirgu-Mures, 2004

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2019
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2012
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2019

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Sep 2012

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2012