THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
25/05/25 04:22:35 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Peshawar, 2002
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, PANJABI/PUNJABI, PUSHTO, URDU

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1525 Bristol Rd W
Unit 12
Mississauga ON L5M 4Z1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905812 5555
Fax: 9058125515
Address: B-6 Harvey St
Chatham ON N7M 1L6
Phone: 18558846638
Fax: 18559672945

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 16 Dec 2014
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 16 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Zainab Shireen Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 10 Jun 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. Z. Shireen (CPSO#: 98222 )
Business Address: B-6 Harvey St
Chatham ON N7M 1L6
Business Address: 19 Main Street West
Kingsville Ontario N9Y 1H2
Business Address: 889 Exmouth Street
Suite 3
Sarnia Ontario N7T 5R3
(226) 778-4811
Business Address: 103B - 1040 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay Ontario P7B 7A5
Business Address: 90 Hasting Street North
Bancroft Ontario K0L 1C0
(613) 704-1245
Business Address: U 19 - 9225 Highway 93
Midland Ontario L4R 4K4
(249) 492-6406
Business Address: 6 - 1625 Sherbrooke Street West
Peterborough Ontario K9K 0E6
Business Address: 44 Ottawa Street West
Havelock Ontario K0L 1Z0
(705) 304-0018
Business Address: 4781 Highway 11/17
Kakabeka Falls Ontario P0T 1W0
Business Address: Suite 12
1525 Bristol Raod West
Mississauga Ontario L5M 4Z1
(905) 812-5555
Business Address: 100 King Street West
Chatham Ontario N7M 6A9

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, PANJABI/PUNJABI, PUSHTO, URDU
Medical School: University of Peshawar, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1525 Bristol Rd W
Unit 12
Mississauga ON L5M 4Z1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905812 5555
Fax: 9058125515
Address: B-6 Harvey St
Chatham ON N7M 1L6
Phone: 18558846638
Fax: 18559672945

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 16 Dec 2014
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 16 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Zainab Shireen Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 10 Jun 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. Z. Shireen (CPSO#: 98222 )
Business Address: B-6 Harvey St
Chatham ON N7M 1L6
Business Address: 19 Main Street West
Kingsville Ontario N9Y 1H2
Business Address: 889 Exmouth Street
Suite 3
Sarnia Ontario N7T 5R3
(226) 778-4811
Business Address: 103B - 1040 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay Ontario P7B 7A5
Business Address: 90 Hasting Street North
Bancroft Ontario K0L 1C0
(613) 704-1245
Business Address: U 19 - 9225 Highway 93
Midland Ontario L4R 4K4
(249) 492-6406
Business Address: 6 - 1625 Sherbrooke Street West
Peterborough Ontario K9K 0E6
Business Address: 44 Ottawa Street West
Havelock Ontario K0L 1Z0
(705) 304-0018
Business Address: 4781 Highway 11/17
Kakabeka Falls Ontario P0T 1W0
Business Address: Suite 12
1525 Bristol Raod West
Mississauga Ontario L5M 4Z1
(905) 812-5555
Business Address: 100 King Street West
Chatham Ontario N7M 6A9

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ZAINAB SHIREEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHIREEN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ZAINAB SHIREEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHIREEN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Peshawar, 2002

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 03 Mar 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Mar 2015
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 15 Dec 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 13 Aug 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2014
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2012
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 03 Mar 2015

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 03 Mar 2015

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 15 Dec 2014

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Aug 2014
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 13 Aug 2014

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2014

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Sep 2012

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2012