THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
07/05/25 19:18:17 PM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Karachi, 1996
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, URDU

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 825 Coxwell Ave
Michael Garron Hospital
East York ON M4C 3E7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 170 Elizabeth St
The Hospital for Sick Children
Toronto ON M5G 1E8
Phone: (416) 813-1500
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 16 Nov 2022
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine
Effective: 11 Nov 2022
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 16 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

SPECIALTY: Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 11 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
HOSPITAL: Hospital For Sick Children
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Sehr Ansari Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 31 May 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Sehr Ansari (CPSO#: 98224 )
Business Address: 825 Coxwell Ave
East York ON M4C 3E7

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, URDU
Medical School: University of Karachi, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 825 Coxwell Ave
Michael Garron Hospital
East York ON M4C 3E7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 170 Elizabeth St
The Hospital for Sick Children
Toronto ON M5G 1E8
Phone: (416) 813-1500
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 16 Nov 2022
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine
Effective: 11 Nov 2022
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 16 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

SPECIALTY: Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 11 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
HOSPITAL: Hospital For Sick Children
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Sehr Ansari Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 31 May 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Sehr Ansari (CPSO#: 98224 )
Business Address: 825 Coxwell Ave
East York ON M4C 3E7

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
16 Nov 2022
15 Nov 2029
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Nov 16 2022
EXPIRY DATE: Nov 15 2029
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. NAJMUS SEHR ANSARI may practise medicine only,

(i) in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Pediatrics, Division of Neonatology, University of Toronto, in which Dr. SEHR ANSARI holds an academic appointment at the rank of Assistant Professor, and

(ii) in accordance with the requirements of her academic appointment.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires seven years from the date of issuance or when Dr. SEHR ANSARI no longer holds the academic appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

3. The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

(i) the College receives a report indicating that Dr. SEHR ANSARI’s clinical performance, knowledge, skill, judgment, professional conduct, or academic progress is unsatisfactory, or

(ii) the Committee does not receive an annual report or receives a report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or

(iii) when the Committee makes a decision about Dr. SEHR ANSARI’s certificate of registration, following consideration of the practice assessment report.

Note: This certificate is issued on 16 November, 2022. In accordance with paragraphs 2 and 3 above, this certificate will, if not extended by the Registration Committee, automatically expire on 15 November, 2029.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. NAJMUS SEHR ANSARI may practise medicine only,

(i) in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Pediatrics, Division of Neonatology, University of Toronto, in which Dr. SEHR ANSARI holds an academic appointment at the rank of Assistant Professor, and

(ii) in accordance with the requirements of her academic appointment.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires seven years from the date of issuance or when Dr. SEHR ANSARI no longer holds the academic appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

3. The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

(i) the College receives a report indicating that Dr. SEHR ANSARI’s clinical performance, knowledge, skill, judgment, professional conduct, or academic progress is unsatisfactory, or

(ii) the Committee does not receive an annual report or receives a report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or

(iii) when the Committee makes a decision about Dr. SEHR ANSARI’s certificate of registration, following consideration of the practice assessment report.

Note: This certificate is issued on 16 November, 2022. In accordance with paragraphs 2 and 3 above, this certificate will, if not extended by the Registration Committee, automatically expire on 15 November, 2029.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Karachi, 1996

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 16 Nov 2022
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2018
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2014
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2012
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Nov 2022
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 16 Nov 2022
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration by Registration Committee.
Date: Expiry: 15 Nov 2029

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2018

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2014

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Sep 2012

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2012