THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
24/04/25 08:11:54 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Vermont, 2012
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 46 General Hospital Dr
Stratford ON N5A 2Y6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-272-8210
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 18 Dec 2017
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 18 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Huron Perth Healthcare Alliance Stratford
St Joseph's Health Care, London London
Niagara Health System - Fort Erie Site Fort Erie
Niagara Health System - Welland Site Welland
Strathroy Middlesex General Hospital Strathroy
South Bruce Grey Health Centre Chesley Site Chesley
South Bruce Grey Health Centre Walkerton Site Walkerton
Wingham and District Hospital Wingham
South Bruce Grey Health Centre Durham-Memorial Site Durham
Chatham-Kent Health Alliance Chatham
South Bruce Grey Health Centre Walkerton
Four Counties Health Services Newbury
Alexandra Marine and General Hospital Goderich
South Huron Hospital Association Exeter
Tillsonburg District Memorial Hospital Tillsonburg
Niagara Health System Niagara Falls
Listowel Memorial Hospital Listowel
Niagara Health System Ontario Street Site St Catharines
HOSPITAL: Huron Perth Healthcare Alliance
LOCATION: Stratford

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Care, London
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System - Fort Erie Site
LOCATION: Fort Erie

HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System - Welland Site
LOCATION: Welland

HOSPITAL: Strathroy Middlesex General Hospital
LOCATION: Strathroy

HOSPITAL: South Bruce Grey Health Centre Chesley Site
LOCATION: Chesley

HOSPITAL: South Bruce Grey Health Centre Walkerton Site
LOCATION: Walkerton

HOSPITAL: Wingham and District Hospital
LOCATION: Wingham

HOSPITAL: South Bruce Grey Health Centre Durham-Memorial Site
LOCATION: Durham

HOSPITAL: Chatham-Kent Health Alliance
LOCATION: Chatham

HOSPITAL: South Bruce Grey Health Centre
LOCATION: Walkerton

HOSPITAL: Four Counties Health Services
LOCATION: Newbury

HOSPITAL: Alexandra Marine and General Hospital
LOCATION: Goderich

HOSPITAL: South Huron Hospital Association
LOCATION: Exeter

HOSPITAL: Tillsonburg District Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Tillsonburg

HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System
LOCATION: Niagara Falls

HOSPITAL: Listowel Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Listowel

HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System Ontario Street Site
LOCATION: St Catharines

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Kelly Cunningham Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 Mar 2019
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Cunningham (CPSO#: 98250 )
Business Address: 1200 Fourth Avenue
St Catharines Ontario L2S 0A9
(905) 378-4647
Business Address: 450 Central Ave
Suite 104
London ON N6B 2E8
Business Address: 46 General Hospital Dr
Stratford General Hospital
Diagnostic Imaging
Stratford ON N5A 2Y6

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Vermont, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 46 General Hospital Dr
Stratford ON N5A 2Y6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-272-8210
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 18 Dec 2017
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 18 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Huron Perth Healthcare Alliance Stratford
St Joseph's Health Care, London London
Niagara Health System - Fort Erie Site Fort Erie
Niagara Health System - Welland Site Welland
Strathroy Middlesex General Hospital Strathroy
South Bruce Grey Health Centre Chesley Site Chesley
South Bruce Grey Health Centre Walkerton Site Walkerton
Wingham and District Hospital Wingham
South Bruce Grey Health Centre Durham-Memorial Site Durham
Chatham-Kent Health Alliance Chatham
South Bruce Grey Health Centre Walkerton
Four Counties Health Services Newbury
Alexandra Marine and General Hospital Goderich
South Huron Hospital Association Exeter
Tillsonburg District Memorial Hospital Tillsonburg
Niagara Health System Niagara Falls
Listowel Memorial Hospital Listowel
Niagara Health System Ontario Street Site St Catharines
HOSPITAL: Huron Perth Healthcare Alliance
LOCATION: Stratford

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Care, London
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System - Fort Erie Site
LOCATION: Fort Erie

HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System - Welland Site
LOCATION: Welland

HOSPITAL: Strathroy Middlesex General Hospital
LOCATION: Strathroy

HOSPITAL: South Bruce Grey Health Centre Chesley Site
LOCATION: Chesley

HOSPITAL: South Bruce Grey Health Centre Walkerton Site
LOCATION: Walkerton

HOSPITAL: Wingham and District Hospital
LOCATION: Wingham

HOSPITAL: South Bruce Grey Health Centre Durham-Memorial Site
LOCATION: Durham

HOSPITAL: Chatham-Kent Health Alliance
LOCATION: Chatham

HOSPITAL: South Bruce Grey Health Centre
LOCATION: Walkerton

HOSPITAL: Four Counties Health Services
LOCATION: Newbury

HOSPITAL: Alexandra Marine and General Hospital
LOCATION: Goderich

HOSPITAL: South Huron Hospital Association
LOCATION: Exeter

HOSPITAL: Tillsonburg District Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Tillsonburg

HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System
LOCATION: Niagara Falls

HOSPITAL: Listowel Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Listowel

HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System Ontario Street Site
LOCATION: St Catharines

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Kelly Cunningham Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 Mar 2019
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Cunningham (CPSO#: 98250 )
Business Address: 1200 Fourth Avenue
St Catharines Ontario L2S 0A9
(905) 378-4647
Business Address: 450 Central Ave
Suite 104
London ON N6B 2E8
Business Address: 46 General Hospital Dr
Stratford General Hospital
Diagnostic Imaging
Stratford ON N5A 2Y6

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KELLY MAE CUNNINGHAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CUNNINGHAM is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KELLY MAE CUNNINGHAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CUNNINGHAM is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Vermont, 2012

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Sep 2018
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 26 Sep 2018

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2012