THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:59:15 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of British Columbia Faculty of Medicine, 2012
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 401 Smyth Road
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 6137377600
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 5-737 Silver Seven Rd
Capital KidZ Medical Centre
Unit 5
Kanata ON K2V 0H3
Phone: 6138283122
Fax: 6136722010
Address: 4289 Innes Rd
East Ottawa Kids Covid Care Clinic
Orléans ON K1E 0A8
Phone: 6135664470
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1919 Riverside Drive
Ottawa Ontario K1H 7W9
Phone: 6137373121
Fax: 6137376048

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 09 Jun 2021
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 09 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa
Queensway Carleton Hospital Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Queensway Carleton Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: ANDREA TAM MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 10 Dec 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Tam (CPSO#: 98272 )
Business Address: 3045 Baseline Road
Ottawa Ontario K2H 8P4
613-721-2000 Extn: 4816
Business Address: 401 Smyth Road
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L1
613-737-7600
Business Address: 5-737 Silver Seven Road
Ottawa Ontario K2V 0H3
613-828-3122
Business Address: 4289 Innes Road
Ottawa Ontario K1E 0A8
613-566-4470
Business Address: 1919 Riverside Drive
Ottawa Ontario K1H 7W9
613-737-3121

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of British Columbia Faculty of Medicine, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 401 Smyth Road
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 6137377600
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 5-737 Silver Seven Rd
Capital KidZ Medical Centre
Unit 5
Kanata ON K2V 0H3
Phone: 6138283122
Fax: 6136722010
Address: 4289 Innes Rd
East Ottawa Kids Covid Care Clinic
Orléans ON K1E 0A8
Phone: 6135664470
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1919 Riverside Drive
Ottawa Ontario K1H 7W9
Phone: 6137373121
Fax: 6137376048

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 09 Jun 2021
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 09 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa
Queensway Carleton Hospital Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Queensway Carleton Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: ANDREA TAM MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 10 Dec 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Tam (CPSO#: 98272 )
Business Address: 3045 Baseline Road
Ottawa Ontario K2H 8P4
613-721-2000 Extn: 4816
Business Address: 401 Smyth Road
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L1
613-737-7600
Business Address: 5-737 Silver Seven Road
Ottawa Ontario K2V 0H3
613-828-3122
Business Address: 4289 Innes Road
Ottawa Ontario K1E 0A8
613-566-4470
Business Address: 1919 Riverside Drive
Ottawa Ontario K1H 7W9
613-737-3121

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANDREA WING KWAN TAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TAM is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANDREA WING KWAN TAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TAM is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of British Columbia Faculty of Medicine, 2012

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Oct 2021
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 11 Jun 2021
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Oct 2021

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 11 Jun 2021

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2012