THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
23/05/25 04:35:58 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of British Columbia Faculty of Medicine, 2012
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: UHN Toronto General Hospital
Division of Vascular Surgery
200 Elizabeth St
Toronto Ontario M5G 2C4
Business Email: [email protected]
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Vascular Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2018
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Vascular Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
University Health Network Toronto
Sinai Health System Toronto
HOSPITAL: University Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr Miranda Witheford Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 18 Mar 2025
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Witheford (CPSO#: 98276 )
Business Address: 4163403868

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: University of British Columbia Faculty of Medicine, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: UHN Toronto General Hospital
Division of Vascular Surgery
200 Elizabeth St
Toronto Ontario M5G 2C4
Business Email: [email protected]
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Vascular Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2018
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Vascular Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
University Health Network Toronto
Sinai Health System Toronto
HOSPITAL: University Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr Miranda Witheford Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 18 Mar 2025
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Witheford (CPSO#: 98276 )
Business Address: 4163403868

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MIRANDA WITHEFORD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WITHEFORD is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MIRANDA WITHEFORD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WITHEFORD is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of British Columbia Faculty of Medicine, 2012

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jul 2021
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 Jan 2020
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Apr 2019
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2018
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Jul 2021

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 Jan 2020

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Apr 2019

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2018

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2012