THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
28/04/25 06:22:30 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2012
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 170 Simcoe Street
Suite 201
Peterborough Ontario K9H 2H7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 7057420783
Fax: 7059862271

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 23 Jun 2014
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 23 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Peterborough Regional Health Centre Peterborough
HOSPITAL: Peterborough Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Peterborough

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Drs. Scott James and Jaimi Gray Heidman Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 Mar 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Heidman (CPSO#: 98285 ) Dr. J. Heidman (CPSO#: 98286 )
Business Address: 78 Adam and Eve Rd
Buckhorn ON K0L 1J0
705 742 0783

Corporation Name: Drs. Scott James and Jaimi Gray Heidman Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 11 Mar 2021

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 170 Simcoe Street
Suite 201
Peterborough Ontario K9H 2H7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 7057420783
Fax: 7059862271

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 23 Jun 2014
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 23 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Peterborough Regional Health Centre Peterborough
HOSPITAL: Peterborough Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Peterborough

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Drs. Scott James and Jaimi Gray Heidman Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 Mar 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Heidman (CPSO#: 98285 ) Dr. J. Heidman (CPSO#: 98286 )
Business Address: 78 Adam and Eve Rd
Buckhorn ON K0L 1J0
705 742 0783

Corporation Name: Drs. Scott James and Jaimi Gray Heidman Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 11 Mar 2021

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JAIMI GRAY HEIDMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HEIDMAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JAIMI GRAY HEIDMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HEIDMAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2012

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2016
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2016

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2012