THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
29/04/25 09:43:59 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 2012
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Village Family Health Team
Unit 102, Liberty Market Building
171 East Liberty St
Toronto Ontario M6K 3P6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 599-8348
Fax: (416) 599-2001
Address: Hassle Free Men/Trans Clinic
66 Gerrard St E - 2nd Floor
Toronto Ontario M5B 1G3
Phone: (416) 922-0566
Fax: (416) 922-2018

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 15 Jun 2015
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 15 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jason Booy Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 Jun 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Booy (CPSO#: 98293 )
Business Address: Hassle Free Men/Trans Clinic
2nd Floor
66 Gerrard Street East
Toronto Ontario M5B 2M2
(416) 922-0566
Business Address: Village Family Health Team
Liberty Market Building
102 - 171 East Liberty Street
Toronto Ontario M6K 3P6
(416) 599-8348

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Queen's University, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Village Family Health Team
Unit 102, Liberty Market Building
171 East Liberty St
Toronto Ontario M6K 3P6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 599-8348
Fax: (416) 599-2001
Address: Hassle Free Men/Trans Clinic
66 Gerrard St E - 2nd Floor
Toronto Ontario M5B 1G3
Phone: (416) 922-0566
Fax: (416) 922-2018

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 15 Jun 2015
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 15 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jason Booy Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 Jun 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Booy (CPSO#: 98293 )
Business Address: Hassle Free Men/Trans Clinic
2nd Floor
66 Gerrard Street East
Toronto Ontario M5B 2M2
(416) 922-0566
Business Address: Village Family Health Team
Liberty Market Building
102 - 171 East Liberty Street
Toronto Ontario M6K 3P6
(416) 599-8348

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JASON DIRK BOOY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BOOY is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JASON DIRK BOOY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BOOY is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 2012

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 2015
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Jun 2015

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2012