THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
13/05/25 04:30:14 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2012
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, ESTONIAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: RS McLaughlin Durham Reg Cancer Ctr
Department of Radiation Oncology
Room 2C101
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa Ontario L1G 2B9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 576-8711
Extension: 5441
Fax: (905) 721-6101

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Radiation Oncology
Effective: 30 Jun 2017
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Radiation Oncology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Northumberland Hills Hospital Cobourg
Lakeridge Health Oshawa General Site Oshawa
Peterborough Regional Health Centre Peterborough
Ross Memorial Hospital Lindsay
HOSPITAL: Northumberland Hills Hospital
LOCATION: Cobourg

HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health Oshawa General Site
LOCATION: Oshawa

HOSPITAL: Peterborough Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Peterborough

HOSPITAL: Ross Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Lindsay

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Mark Niglas Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 07 Nov 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Niglas (CPSO#: 98314 )
Business Address: 1 Hospital Court
Oshawa Ontario L1G 8A2
Business Address: 147 Maclean Ave
Toronto ON M4E 3A5

Corporation Name: Dr. Mark Niglas Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 07 Nov 2023

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, ESTONIAN
Medical School: McMaster University, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: RS McLaughlin Durham Reg Cancer Ctr
Department of Radiation Oncology
Room 2C101
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa Ontario L1G 2B9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 576-8711
Extension: 5441
Fax: (905) 721-6101

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Radiation Oncology
Effective: 30 Jun 2017
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Radiation Oncology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Northumberland Hills Hospital Cobourg
Lakeridge Health Oshawa General Site Oshawa
Peterborough Regional Health Centre Peterborough
Ross Memorial Hospital Lindsay
HOSPITAL: Northumberland Hills Hospital
LOCATION: Cobourg

HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health Oshawa General Site
LOCATION: Oshawa

HOSPITAL: Peterborough Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Peterborough

HOSPITAL: Ross Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Lindsay

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Mark Niglas Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 07 Nov 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Niglas (CPSO#: 98314 )
Business Address: 1 Hospital Court
Oshawa Ontario L1G 8A2
Business Address: 147 Maclean Ave
Toronto ON M4E 3A5

Corporation Name: Dr. Mark Niglas Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 07 Nov 2023

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARK RICHARD NIGLAS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NIGLAS is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARK RICHARD NIGLAS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NIGLAS is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2012

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Mar 2018
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Mar 2018

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2012