THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
30/04/25 04:21:25 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2012
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 118 7th Ave
Hanover Medical Associates
Hanover ON N4N 2G9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 5193642820
Fax: 5193643965

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 19 Jun 2014
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 19 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
South Bruce Grey Health Centre Walkerton Site Walkerton
Hanover and District Hospital Hanover
HOSPITAL: South Bruce Grey Health Centre Walkerton Site
LOCATION: Walkerton

HOSPITAL: Hanover and District Hospital
LOCATION: Hanover

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Diana Boughan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 Jan 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Boughan (CPSO#: 98315 )
Business Address: Hanover Medical Associates
118 7th Avenue
Hanover Ontario N4N 2G9
(519) 364-2820
Business Address: 21 McGivern Street
Walkerton Ontario N0G 2V0
(519) 881-1220
Business Address: 90 7th Avenue
Hanover Ontario N4N 1N1
(519) 364-2340

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 118 7th Ave
Hanover Medical Associates
Hanover ON N4N 2G9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 5193642820
Fax: 5193643965

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 19 Jun 2014
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 19 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
South Bruce Grey Health Centre Walkerton Site Walkerton
Hanover and District Hospital Hanover
HOSPITAL: South Bruce Grey Health Centre Walkerton Site
LOCATION: Walkerton

HOSPITAL: Hanover and District Hospital
LOCATION: Hanover

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Diana Boughan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 Jan 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Boughan (CPSO#: 98315 )
Business Address: Hanover Medical Associates
118 7th Avenue
Hanover Ontario N4N 2G9
(519) 364-2820
Business Address: 21 McGivern Street
Walkerton Ontario N0G 2V0
(519) 881-1220
Business Address: 90 7th Avenue
Hanover Ontario N4N 1N1
(519) 364-2340

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DIANA JEAN LAWRIE BOUGHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BOUGHAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DIANA JEAN LAWRIE BOUGHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BOUGHAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2012

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Mar 2015
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 05 Mar 2015

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2012