THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
30/04/25 04:42:54 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2012
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 103-535 Belmont Ave W
Belmont Family Medicine
Kitchener ON N2M 5E9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-579-4870
Fax: 519-579-9334
Address: 421 Greenbrook Drive
Kitchener Ontario N2M 4L3
Phone: 519-578-3510
Fax: 519-578-6040

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 16 Dec 2014
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 16 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Cambridge Memorial Hospital Cambridge
HOSPITAL: Cambridge Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Cambridge

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Andrew Davis Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Aug 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Davis (CPSO#: 98318 )
Business Address: 103-535 Belmont Ave W
Kitchener ON N2M 5E9
519-579-4870
Business Address: Suite 102
535 Belmont Street
Kitchener Ontario N2M 5E9
(519) 576-1630
Business Address: Unit 23B
421 Greenbrook Drive
Kitchener Ontario N2M 4K1
(519) 578-3510
Business Address: Suite 208 and 204
430 The Boardwalk
Waterloo Ontario N2T 0C1
(519) 576-2992
Business Address: 102-520 University Avenue West
Waterloo Ontario N2T 2Z6
(519) 576-4910

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 103-535 Belmont Ave W
Belmont Family Medicine
Kitchener ON N2M 5E9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-579-4870
Fax: 519-579-9334
Address: 421 Greenbrook Drive
Kitchener Ontario N2M 4L3
Phone: 519-578-3510
Fax: 519-578-6040

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 16 Dec 2014
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 16 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Cambridge Memorial Hospital Cambridge
HOSPITAL: Cambridge Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Cambridge

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Andrew Davis Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Aug 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Davis (CPSO#: 98318 )
Business Address: 103-535 Belmont Ave W
Kitchener ON N2M 5E9
519-579-4870
Business Address: Suite 102
535 Belmont Street
Kitchener Ontario N2M 5E9
(519) 576-1630
Business Address: Unit 23B
421 Greenbrook Drive
Kitchener Ontario N2M 4K1
(519) 578-3510
Business Address: Suite 208 and 204
430 The Boardwalk
Waterloo Ontario N2T 0C1
(519) 576-2992
Business Address: 102-520 University Avenue West
Waterloo Ontario N2T 2Z6
(519) 576-4910

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANDREW DAVIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DAVIS is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANDREW DAVIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DAVIS is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2012

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Feb 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 28 Aug 2015
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 09 Feb 2016

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 28 Aug 2015

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2012