THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:43:26 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2012
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Walker Family Cancer Centre
St. Catherine's General Hospital
1200 Fourth Ave
St. Catharines Ontario L2S 0A9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 682-6451
Fax: (905) 682-3391
Address: 219 Queenston Street
St. Catharines Ontario L2P 2W9
Phone: (905) 685-8082
Fax: (905) 988-5776

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Hematology
Effective: 03 Nov 2017
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2016
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Hematology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 03 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Niagara Health System Ontario Street Site St Catharines
HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System Ontario Street Site
LOCATION: St Catharines

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Mary Salib Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 Oct 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Salib (CPSO#: 98320 )
Business Address: Walker Family Cancer Centre
St. Catharines General Hospital
1200 Fourth Avenue
St Catharines Ontario L2S 0A9
(905) 682-6451
Business Address: 219 Queenston Street
St Catharines Ontario L2P 2W9
(905) 685-8082

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Walker Family Cancer Centre
St. Catherine's General Hospital
1200 Fourth Ave
St. Catharines Ontario L2S 0A9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 682-6451
Fax: (905) 682-3391
Address: 219 Queenston Street
St. Catharines Ontario L2P 2W9
Phone: (905) 685-8082
Fax: (905) 988-5776

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Hematology
Effective: 03 Nov 2017
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2016
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Hematology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 03 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Niagara Health System Ontario Street Site St Catharines
HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System Ontario Street Site
LOCATION: St Catharines

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Mary Salib Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 Oct 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Salib (CPSO#: 98320 )
Business Address: Walker Family Cancer Centre
St. Catharines General Hospital
1200 Fourth Avenue
St Catharines Ontario L2S 0A9
(905) 682-6451
Business Address: 219 Queenston Street
St Catharines Ontario L2P 2W9
(905) 685-8082

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARY SALIB may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SALIB is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARY SALIB may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SALIB is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2012

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2016
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2016

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2012