THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 04:43:11 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Memorial University of Newfoundland Faculty of Medicine, 2012
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Peterborough Regional Health Centre
1 Hospital Dr
Peterborough Ontario K9J 7C6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 743-2121
Extension: 5028
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 03 Jun 2018
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 03 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Peterborough Regional Health Centre Peterborough
HOSPITAL: Peterborough Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Peterborough

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Amy Colbourne Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 07 Nov 2018
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Colbourne (CPSO#: 98335 )
Business Address: 105-380 Burnham Street
Peterborough Ontario K9H 1T6
(705) 741-3489
Business Address: 304 Bellevue Street
Peterborough Ontario K9H 5G1
(705) 743-7100
Business Address: 150 Strickland Street
Lakefield Ontario K0L 2H0
(705) 651-0505
Business Address: Peterborough Regional Health Centre
1 Hospital Drive
Peterborough Ontario K9J 7C6
(705) 743-2121
Business Address: 170 Simcoe Street
Peterborough Ontario K9H 2H7
(705) 742-0783

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Memorial University of Newfoundland Faculty of Medicine, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Peterborough Regional Health Centre
1 Hospital Dr
Peterborough Ontario K9J 7C6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 743-2121
Extension: 5028
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 03 Jun 2018
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 03 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Peterborough Regional Health Centre Peterborough
HOSPITAL: Peterborough Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Peterborough

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Amy Colbourne Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 07 Nov 2018
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Colbourne (CPSO#: 98335 )
Business Address: 105-380 Burnham Street
Peterborough Ontario K9H 1T6
(705) 741-3489
Business Address: 304 Bellevue Street
Peterborough Ontario K9H 5G1
(705) 743-7100
Business Address: 150 Strickland Street
Lakefield Ontario K0L 2H0
(705) 651-0505
Business Address: Peterborough Regional Health Centre
1 Hospital Drive
Peterborough Ontario K9J 7C6
(705) 743-2121
Business Address: 170 Simcoe Street
Peterborough Ontario K9H 2H7
(705) 742-0783

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. AMY JANICE COLBOURNE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. COLBOURNE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. AMY JANICE COLBOURNE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. COLBOURNE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Memorial University of Newfoundland Faculty of Medicine, 2012

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Jun 2018
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 03 Jun 2018
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 04 Jan 2018
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 04 Jan 2018
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2017
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2015
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 03 Jun 2018

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 03 Jun 2018

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 04 Jan 2018

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 04 Jan 2018
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 04 Jan 2018

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2017

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2017

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2015
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2015

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2015

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2012