THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:34:24 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2012
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Northern Roots Medical Group
555 Barrydowne Road
Suite 105
Sudbury Ontario P3A 3T4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 524-7312
Fax: (705) 524-7897
Address: Health Sciences North
41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury Ontario P3E 5J1
Phone: (705) 523-7100
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Primacy Medical Centre
c/o Real Canadian Superstore
1485 Lasalle Boulevard
Sudbury Ontario P3A 5H7
Phone: (705) 222-7451
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1485 Bancroft Drive
Sudbury Ontario P3B1R6
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: 705-222-3372

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 26 Jun 2014
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 26 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Other Health and Non-Health Professions

PROFESSION JURISDICTION
Teaching Canada - Ontario
PROFESSION: Teaching
JURISDICTION: Canada - Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Health Sciences North Sudbury
HOSPITAL: Health Sciences North
LOCATION: Sudbury

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Natasha Evelyn St-Onge Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Jun 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. N. St-Onge (CPSO#: 98340 )
Business Address: 1485 Bancroft Drive
Sudbury Ontario P3B 1R6
Business Address: 1485 Lasalle Boulevard
Sudbury Ontario P3A 5H7
(705) 222-7451
Business Address: 41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury Ontario P3E 5J1
(705) 523-7100
Business Address: Northern Roots Medical Group
555 Barrydowne Road
Suite 105
Sudbury Ontario P3A 3T4
(705) 524-7312

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Northern Roots Medical Group
555 Barrydowne Road
Suite 105
Sudbury Ontario P3A 3T4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 524-7312
Fax: (705) 524-7897
Address: Health Sciences North
41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury Ontario P3E 5J1
Phone: (705) 523-7100
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Primacy Medical Centre
c/o Real Canadian Superstore
1485 Lasalle Boulevard
Sudbury Ontario P3A 5H7
Phone: (705) 222-7451
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1485 Bancroft Drive
Sudbury Ontario P3B1R6
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: 705-222-3372

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 26 Jun 2014
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 26 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Other Health and Non-Health Professions

PROFESSION JURISDICTION
Teaching Canada - Ontario
PROFESSION: Teaching
JURISDICTION: Canada - Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Health Sciences North Sudbury
HOSPITAL: Health Sciences North
LOCATION: Sudbury

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Natasha Evelyn St-Onge Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Jun 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. N. St-Onge (CPSO#: 98340 )
Business Address: 1485 Bancroft Drive
Sudbury Ontario P3B 1R6
Business Address: 1485 Lasalle Boulevard
Sudbury Ontario P3A 5H7
(705) 222-7451
Business Address: 41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury Ontario P3E 5J1
(705) 523-7100
Business Address: Northern Roots Medical Group
555 Barrydowne Road
Suite 105
Sudbury Ontario P3A 3T4
(705) 524-7312

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NATASHA EVELYN ST-ONGE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ST-ONGE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NATASHA EVELYN ST-ONGE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ST-ONGE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2012

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2014
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2014

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2012